judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALONZO W. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1197
Short Caption:ALONZO W. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:88-CF-1197Consolidated: 89-CF-1197
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8797-87Filed Date:09/16/1988

Opening Event Date:09/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlonzo W. Johnson N
Dennis M. HartNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, ALONZO W. UNITED STATES
09/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DENNIS M. HART, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD DSA
01/25/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD R
03/07/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT'S MLR PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BA
03/16/1989RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING APLT COUNSEL MO TO W/DRAW & AFFIRMING THE ORD ON APPEAL. ACG PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD VS
07/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
08/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD