judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANK CASTILLO SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1258
Short Caption:FRANK CASTILLO SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4757-83Filed Date:09/29/1988

Opening Event Date:09/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrank Castillo Smith N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, FRANK CASTILLO AKA MANUEL CERRA UNITED STATES
09/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
10/18/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/17/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD