judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RALPH T. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1235
Short Caption:RALPH T. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13205-87Filed Date:09/19/1988

Opening Event Date:09/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/24/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/24/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRalph T. Wilson N
Richard S. Greenlee YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Celillianne Green YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, RALPH T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GREENCE FOR - APPELLEE
09/19/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
01/24/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/24/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (52 PGS /FINNERIN) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD R
02/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (87 PGS RT - SWARINGER) GT PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-19-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BA
04/14/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF ON OR BEFORE 4/19/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 19, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
05/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-19-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD BA
05/25/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA TO AND INC. 6/19/89. NFX MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/24/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD BE
07/25/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/24/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD M
08/24/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD BE
11/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BREIF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. GW PANELFESTSC SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD VS
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1989ARGUED PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD