judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELIZABETH T. BLAKE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1256
Short Caption:ELIZABETH T. BLAKE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6417-87Filed Date:09/27/1988

Opening Event Date:09/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/01/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Anthony P. Farley YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLAKE, ELIZABETH T. UNITED STATES
09/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
11/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD R
06/01/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/01/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(237 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LDG BRIEF, APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD V
08/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-21-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD BE
09/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/5/89 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD M
02/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD