judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUSSELL GRAY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1252
Short Caption:RUSSELL GRAY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Lead:88-CF-1252Consolidated: 90-CF-0282
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1073-88Filed Date:09/19/1988

Opening Event Date:09/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRussell Gray, Jr.N
Lonnie Mark Greenblatt NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas W. Farquhar NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Herbie Difonzo YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patrice I. Kopistansky YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAY JR., RUSSELL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 120788 ORDER: DENY MO FOR RT NOTE - 01 W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL BEFORE NOTE - 02 TRIAL CT FOR CONS IN THE FIRST NOTE - 02 INSTANCE; FO: COUNSEL IN 10 NOTE - 03 DAYS TO TAKE NEC STEPS TO NOTE - 03 CAUSE RT TO BE ORD & PREPARED NOTE - 04 FOR THIS APPEAL & FILE STATE NOTE - 04 INDICATING SUCH W/THIS CT W/IN NOTE - 05 THAT SAME TIME. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 12/15/88 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 06 FOR REMAND W/OUR PREJ TO ITS NOTE - 07 RENEWAL IN EVENT TRL COURT NOTE - 07 INDICATED ITS WILLINGNESS TO NOTE - 08 GRANT RELIEF REQ SEE SMITH V. NOTE - 08 POLLIN. NOTE - 09 1/19/90 ORD: GRT LTR OF CNSL NOTE - 09 REQ RECONSD OF MO TO W/D NOTE - 10 APPEAL & APPEAL IS HEREBY NOTE - 10 REINSTATED. THE BRF OF APLT NOTE - 11 SHALL BE FILE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 3/27/90 ORD: SS, CONS 88-1252 NOTE - 12 & 90-282; GRANT MO OF COUNSEL NOTE - 13 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 13 OF LONNIE GREENBLATT & APPT NOTE - 14 J. HERBIE DIFONZO FOR APLT; NOTE - 14 APLT TO FL DSA IN 90-282 IN NOTE - 15 10 DAYS; CLK OF SUPER CRT TO NOTE - 15 PREPARE & TRANSMIT REC IN NO. NOTE - 16 90-282 FORTHWITH. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 CON 90-282 NOTE - 17
01/01/1906 FARQUHART (FOR LIMITED APPEARANCE)
09/19/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LONNIE MARK GREENBLATT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
10/31/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND (FILED BY T. FARQUHAR) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 05. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD M
12/15/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-08. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD Q
12/16/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 7TH ORDER REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD STATE
02/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD R
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(154 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
03/20/1989RECEIVED COPY OF TR COURT'S ORDER RE: REDUCTION OF SENTENCE DATED 3/17/89 STAMPED 3/20/89. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(6 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 070289 SCHPRD RT
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (8 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQUESTING WITHDRAWAL OF APL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989LETTER REFERRING LTR FROM APLT TO COUNSEL FOR A RESPONSE SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989MEMORANDUM CPY OF LTR FROM DDW RETURNED (ADDRESS UNKNOWN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/27/1989LETTER FROM APLT'S COUNSEL RE: APLT'S DESIRE TO PROCEED WITH THE APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD ANS
01/19/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 THRU 11. GW PANELRO SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD M
02/22/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD BA
02/28/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND FOR APPT. OF NEW COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. HERBIE DiFONZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12-16. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1990RECORD ON APPEAL JT PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD R
04/05/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 90-282 RJG PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD DSA
04/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 27,1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052990 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/27/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B
06/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1990SUBMITTED PANELSCWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELSCWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 585 A.2d 164
01/11/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0102
02/01/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD