judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY J. TURNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1237
Short Caption:STANLEY J. TURNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1972-88Filed Date:09/20/1988

Opening Event Date:09/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStanley J. Turner N
Alfred J. Merlie YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TURNER, STANLEY J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CHARLES ELEY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 8/2/89 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 02 FILE BRF ON OR BEF 8/10/89. NOTE - 03 ANY FURTH REQUEST FOR AN EXT. NOTE - 03 OF TIME WILL BE LOOKED UPON NOTE - 04 WITH DISFAVOR. NOTE - 04
09/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
02/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (25 PGS/TREMEL) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD R
03/10/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(187 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD BA
05/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042789 SCHPRD CHECK
05/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD BA
06/09/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/13/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BE
06/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/13/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062189 SCHPRD OPA
07/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 10TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 071389 SCHPRD BE
08/02/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD N
08/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/17/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD CSUM
01/31/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD