judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE B. THORN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1230
Short Caption:WILLIE B. THORN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8880-87Filed Date:09/20/1988

Opening Event Date:09/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Alfred J. Merlie NN
AppellantWillie B. Thorn N
Boniface K. CobbinaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THORN, WILLIE B. AKA BOBBY D. THORNE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/16/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATE APPMT OF ALFRED J. NOTE - 02 MERLIE & APPT BONIFACE NOTE - 03 COBBINA FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 03 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 05/24/90 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 04 SHALL IN 10 DAYS, SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 05 WHY HIS APPOINTMENT SHOULD NOT NOTE - 05 BE VACATED & HIS NAME REMOVED NOTE - 06 FROM THE PANEL OF ATTORNEYS NOTE - 06 AUTHORIZED TO RECEIVE NOTE - 07 APPOINTMENTS UNDER THE CJA. NOTE - 07
01/01/1906 MERLIEA VACATED 3/16/90.
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
02/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD R
07/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(173 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/2/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
08/22/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/20/89, MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD M
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY UNTIL COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR NAME REMOVED FROM CJA LIST. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD BA
10/30/1989ORDER VACATING THIS CT 10/18/89 ORD, APLT W/IN 15 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE STATUS OF RT JB PANELRO SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BA
11/20/1989STATEMENT TO STATUS OF TR AD PANEL SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD STATE
03/02/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BONIFACE K. COBBINA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 030690 SCHPRD GG
05/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 THUR 07 GW PANELRO SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD V
06/04/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-& MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BA AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD CHECK
06/18/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF IN 15 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. NFX JJ PANELDJDW SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD B
06/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 070390 SCHPRD BA
07/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE ADDITIONAL WEEK RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 5 DAYS OR NAME REMOVED FROM CJA LIST. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD V
08/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD BA
08/14/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF; APLE BRF SHALL BE FL W/I 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD B
10/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 100490 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD