judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHAN A. SLYE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1231
Short Caption:NATHAN A. SLYE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F312-87Filed Date:09/19/1988

Opening Event Date:09/19/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/26/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/05/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNathan A. Slye N
Angela Kiper YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven J. Mccool YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SLYE, NATHAN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KIPERA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCCOOLS FOR - APPELLEE
09/19/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/18/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DR AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
02/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (8 PGS RT - DAVIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD R
02/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(4 PGS/FRANKLIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(543 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 012089 SCHPRD RT
12/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (11-PGS/BURNEY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
12/29/1989RECORD COMPLETED
09/18/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELFF SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD CHECK
10/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-29-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD BA
11/06/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 11-29-90. NFX GR PANEL SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD GR
11/30/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 112990 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 010491 SCHPRD BE
01/04/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/12/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO FL LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 031491 SCHPRD VS
03/19/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 032291 SCHPRD OPE
03/26/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/26/1991ARGUED PANELTESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELTESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE
01/15/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0078
02/05/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD