judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL M. RAYMOND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1199
Short Caption:MICHAEL M. RAYMOND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4007-88Filed Date:09/16/1988

Opening Event Date:09/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael M. Raymond N
Warren GormanNN
AppellantMichael M. Raymond N
Christopher J. Melcher YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James F. Rutherford YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAYMOND, MICHAEL M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 121488 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 01 PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ONLY NOTE - 02 TO THE EXTENT THAT THE CLK OF NOTE - 02 THE SUP COURT TO TRANSMIT REC NOTE - 03 W/OUT FEE FORTHWITH; INASMUCH NOTE - 03 AS THE MO REQUESTS RT THE MO NOTE - 04 IS DENIED W/OUT PREJUDICE TO NOTE - 04 ITS RENEWAL BEFORE THE TRIAL NOTE - 05 CT FOR CONSID IN THE FIRST NOTE - 05 INSTANCE; APLT IN 10 DAYS TO NOTE - 06 TO FILE MO FOR PREP OF RT IN NOTE - 06 THE TRIAL CT & SERVE A COPY NOTE - 07 W/THIS COURT W/IN THAT SAME NOTE - 07 TIME.
09/16/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/13/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
10/19/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT PRO SE FOR TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE SRT & PAY FEE OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD CHECK
10/25/1988DESIGNATION OF RECORD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD DSA
10/25/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988LETTER TO APLT RE HIS LTR RECVD 10/19/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD Q
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FOR PAYMENT OF TRANSCRIPT AND ANY OTHER FUTURE COURT COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 07. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD R
12/20/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989ORDER APLT BR DUE BY 1/30/89. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 122688 SCHPRD ANS
01/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT HAS BEEN RECEIVED GT PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD BA
01/19/1989RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PREP- ARATION OF TRANSCRIPT FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (FORM 5) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(286 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE LETTER REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD M
08/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(84 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1989RECORD COMPLETED
08/25/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 24, 1989 PANEL SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD OPE
10/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 102489 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA TO AND INC 11/14/89. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990ORDER DIRG CLERK TO FILE APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1, 1990 NO OPPO AJ PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD BE
02/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/1/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD V
03/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/20/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/21/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1994LETTER - of aplt requesting for an attorney
09/21/1994ORDER - Deny appellant's request for the appointment of counsel. FERYNW