judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLAUDE BLACKWELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1198
Short Caption:CLAUDE BLACKWELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11169-86Filed Date:09/16/1988

Opening Event Date:09/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/14/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClaude Blackwell N
K. Duff Lewis YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roy W. McLeese, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLACKWELL, CLAUDE UNITED STATES
09/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) K. DUFF LEWIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD DSA
11/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 111088 SCHPRD DSA
01/24/1989RECORD ON APPEAL 23 & 42 PGS CALHOUN/ 34 PGS-LEWIS AD PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD R
01/24/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (105 PGS RT - PIRFO) GT PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (79 PGS RT - J&J) GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
10/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/18/89. PANELRO SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD V
11/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (ORDER JUDGE GRAAE DATED 10/24/89) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/14/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 20 DAYS OR APTMT TO BE VACATED & REFRD TO BPR. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD BA
06/26/1990ORDER DIR APLE TO FL BRF OR CASE TO BE SCHD ON REC ON APPEAL AND APLT'S BRF ALONE. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD V
06/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 27, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 070690 SCHPRD BE
07/06/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/27/90; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD CHECK
07/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/04/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD