judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAWKINS, LARRY D. HALL, R. DAVID

Case Information: 86-CV-0786
Short Caption:HAWKINS, LARRY D. HALL, R. DAVIDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA07383-85Filed Date:05/13/1986

Opening Event Date:05/13/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/22/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/12/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/10/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Kathleen A. Murray NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Hugh J. Beins YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
John R. Mooney NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John C. Dempsey YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kimberlee Keller NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAWKINS, LARRY D. ET AL HALL, R. DAVID ET AL
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/02/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BEINSH FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - KELLERK FOR - APPELLEES
01/01/1906 DEMPSEYJO AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE NICHOLSK (DIR. OF LABOR RELATIONS)
05/13/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/28/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (AMERICAN FEDER. OF STATE) TO CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 060986 SCHPRD CHECK
06/25/1986MEMORANDUM NO 7A...DR/SRT DUE JULY 9th PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & STATEMENT REGARDING TRANS- CRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070986 SCHPRD DR
07/21/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 072986 SCHPRD R
07/22/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 090186 SCHPRD BA
09/02/1986APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD WITH APPENDICES B THRU E FILED WITH THE APLT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1986RECEIVED OPPOSITION OF APPELLEE TO MO- TION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 091586 SCHPRD OPE
09/18/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 091986 SCHPRD CHECK
10/07/1986FiledBriefing Completed
10/07/1986APPELEE'S BRIEF (A.M.S., C.M.E., AFL-CIO, COUNCIL 20, LOCAL 2093) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1986ORDER GRANT MO FOR LV TO FL OPPO TO MO TO SUPP; REFER MO TO SUPP TO THE TRIAL JUDGE. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 092386 SCHPRD RBH
10/30/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MO TO SUPP THE RECORD. ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/12/1987ARGUED PANELPYFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1987RECEIVED STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF (DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/20/1987APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 030487 SCHPRD OPE
03/11/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD OUT OF TIME PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1987ORDER GRANT APLES' MO FOR LV TO FILE OPPO, CLK TO FILE LDGD OPPO; DENY APLTS' MO TO SUP REC. EBP PANELPYFETE SCDATE 022587 SCHPRD VS
03/24/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLTS' MO TO SUP REC. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELPYFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 537 A.2d 571
02/17/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0226
03/10/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD