judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARL A. CLARK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1264
Short Caption:EARL A. CLARK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3580-86Filed Date:09/23/1988

Opening Event Date:09/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/17/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarl A. Clark N
Curt S. HansenYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Eric M. Acker YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLARK, EARL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 122289 ORD: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 01 WITHDRAW APPOINTMENT OF NOTE - 02 STEPHEN G. MILLIKEN, ESQ., & NOTE - 02 CURT S. HANSEN, ESQ. ENTERED NOTE - 03 AS COUNSEL OF RECORD; APLT'S NOTE - 03 BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 2/14/90 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 04 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF W/OUT PREJ NOTE - 05 TO RENEWAL PROVIDED ANY COL- NOTE - 05 LATERAL ATTACK OF THE CONVIC- NOTE - 06 TION IS COMMENCED IN THE TRL NOTE - 06 CRT IN 30 DAYS; IN THE EVENT NOTE - 07 SUCH ATTACK IS NOT MADE, APLTS NOTE - 07 BRF SHALL BE FL IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 08 07/18/90 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MO NOTE - 08 TO FL REC & CLK TO FL LODGED NOTE - 09 PHYCHOLOGICAL REPORT AS A NOTE - 09 SUPMTAL REC;& LODGED REPLY BRF NOTE - 10 IS FILED; F/O APLE'S MO TO EXT NOTE - 10 TM TO FL BRF IS GRANTED & CLK NOTE - 11 TO FL APLE'S BRF; F/O THAT NOTE - 11 CASE TO BE SCHD FOR CONSID NOTE - 12 BEFORE A MERITS DIV OF THIS NOTE - 12 CRT AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. NOTE - 13 10/30/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 13 TO STAY APPEAL & THIS CASE IS NOTE - 14 HEREBY STAYED PENDG F/O OF NOTE - 14 THIS CRT; F/O COUNS FOR APLT NOTE - 15 TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 NOTE - 15 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO NOTE - 16 FL IN TRL CRT. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 12/19/91 EN BANC ORD: GRANT NOTE - 17 REHRG TO THE EXTENT THAT THE NOTE - 18 MOJ FILED 10/10/91, HEREIN, NOTE - 18 IS AMENDED AND REISSUED IN NOTE - 19 AMENDED FORM THIS DAY, AND THE NOTE - 19 PET. IS OTHERWISE DENITED. NOTE - 20 FURTH ORD THAT THE PET FOR NOTE - 20 REHRG EN BANC IS DENIED. NOTE - 21 JUDGE FARRELL IS RECUSED FROM NOTE - 21 THIS CASE.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/09/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HANSENC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ACKERE FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 MILLIKENS WITHDRAWN: 12/22/89
09/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN G. MILLIKEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA NFX. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
11/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD DSA
02/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (158 PGS/BREMEN)(21 PGS/DAVIS) AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD R
06/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(140 PGS/VAN BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 111289 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989ORDER DENY MO FOR EXT TO FL RT; RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(52 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD RT
08/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (160 PGS RT - SCHOCH) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(608 PGS/SANBORN) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
11/27/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS TO SUB. W/ CURT S. HANSEN AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CURT S. HANSEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD M
01/30/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FORTY DAYS (40) (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 013190 SCHPRD BA
02/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD Q
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD ANSA
03/26/1990APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-18-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1990RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990RECEIVED APPELANT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08 THUR 12 GW PANELRO SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD V
07/18/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13 THRU 16 GW PANELRO SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD V
12/03/1990STATEMENT APPELLANT'S OF TRIAL COURT MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 112990 SCHPRD ANSA
04/25/1991ORDER DIR APLT TO FL STATUS OF 23-110 PENDING W/IN 30 DAYS. AD PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (J. VON KANN ORDER DATED 5/10/91) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1991APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 4/25/91 ORDER AJ PANEL SCDATE 052791 SCHPRD ANSA
05/31/1991ORDER 23-110 MO DENIED; CLK TO SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/17/1991ARGUED PANELRGSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/30/1991MOTION FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1991ORDER GRNT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL PET & CLK IS DIRCTED TO FL THE LODGED PETITION. CKT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL SL PANELROSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD