Case: 07-85-00344-CR
07-85-00344-CR
12/16/1985
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Villareal, Andres Pena
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/30/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/28/1986 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/26/1986 | Submitted | | |
05/28/1986 | Brief Filed | | |
05/06/1986 | Brief Filed | | |
04/29/1986 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
04/29/1986 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/18/1986 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
12/16/1985 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/16/1985 | Letter of Inquiry filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/30/1986 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
100th District Court
Childress
Honorable John T. Forbis
3254
10 years