judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FAIRWAY VILLAS PROPERTY OWNERS VS. FAIRWAY VILLAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Information: 36258
Short Caption:FAIRWAY VILLAS PROPERTY OWNERS VS. FAIRWAY VILLAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIPCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A415860Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/15/2000 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Burdman & Benson, LLP--check no. 9026.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09822
06/15/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 29, 2000. 00-17913
01/29/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 28, 2001. 01-01928
05/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 6, 2001. 01-08439
06/11/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-09711
06/11/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
06/20/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-10366
06/25/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Returned Unfiled Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. (Blank Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
07/03/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-11239
07/06/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-11417
10/16/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. 01-17490
10/25/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. filed on October 16, 2001. Appellants shall have to and including November 19, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Among those signing the stipulation was attorney Jack Bell on behalf of Bramble Development Group. Because Bramble Development Group was not identified as a party to this appeal in either the case appeal statement or the docketing statement filed with this court, Bramble Development Group is not listed as a party to this appeal. Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file an amended docketing statement that clearly identifies all parties to this appeal. If appellants do not timely file an amended docketing statement, Bramble Development Group will not be added as a party to this appeal. Attorney David S. Lee from the law firm of Weil & Lee signed the stipulation on behalf of respondents Fairway Villas, LP.; Schulman Development Corporation; and NAM II Corporation. This court's docket indicates, however, that counsel of record for these respondents is Andrew P. Gordon from the law firm of McDonald, Carano, Wilson, McCune, Bergin, Frankovich & Hicks, LLP. If Mr. Lee will be acting as co-counsel to Mr. Gordon on appeal, Mr. Lee shall file a notice of appearance with this court within 10 days of the date of this order. Alternatively, if Mr. Lee will be acting as sole counsel of record for these respondents, Mr. Lee shall file a substitution of attorney in compliance with SCR 46 within the same time period. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants.) 01-17949
11/01/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-18275
11/08/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Filed in the district court on August 28, 2001. Weil & Lee in place and stead of McDonald, Carano, McCune, Bergin, Frankovich & Hicks as counsel for respondents. 01-18678
11/13/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Appellants Application to Enlarge Time for Filing of Appellants' Opening Brief. 01-18834
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 1, 2001. Appellant's shall have until December 19, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time may result in the denial of the motion. 01-19229
11/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for response. 01-19249
12/21/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to file brief of the Nevada Trial Lawyers Association as Amicus Curiae in Support of Position of Appellant. 01-21573
12/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Beckley Singleton, Chtd., and Daniel F. Polsenberg and Jay T. Hopkins. 01-21629
12/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application to Enlarge Time for Filing of Appellants' Opening Brief. 01-21630
12/24/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Nam II's Non-Opposition to Appellant's Application to Enlarge Time for Filing of Appellant's Opening Brief. 01-21631
01/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 21, 2001, the Nevada Trial Lawyers Association (NTLA) filed a motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of appellants' position. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. We direct the clerk of this court to file the Amicus Brief received on December 21, 2001. On December 24, 2001, appellants filed a motion for a third extension of time to file the opening brief. Unforeseeable circumstances having been shown, we grant the unopposed motion. Appellants shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 19, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-00791
01/11/2002BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of The Nevada Trial Lawyers Association in Support of Appellants' Brief. Mailed on: 12/19/01. 01-21576
01/22/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/18/02. 02-01450
01/22/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-01451
02/25/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 21, 2002. 02-03521
02/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. Pending our resolution of the jurisdictional issue, the briefing schedule is suspended. 02-03584
04/04/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to extend time to respond to order to show cause. 02-06007
04/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 4, 2002. Appellants shall file and serve a response to the February 26, 2002, order by May 2, 2002. 02-07421
05/06/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-07957
05/09/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Troy L. Isaacson stating that the parties have reached a tentative settlement in this matter. Once the settlement is finalized, they will submit a Stipulation and Order for Dismissal. 02-08175
05/16/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-08605
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08702
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2002. 02-08702