judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERRY JAMES KEMP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-54)
Case Number:06-54Case Docketed On:03/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JERRY JAMES KEMP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JERRY JAMES KEMP, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJerry James KempKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/15/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/01/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/28/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/17/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/17/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal