judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SULLIVAN VS. SULLIVAN

Case Information: 36259
Short Caption:SULLIVAN VS. SULLIVANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D231177Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/20/2000 / Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joseph W. Houston-check no. 12828.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09821
06/20/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 22, 2000. 00-13119
08/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. John D. Jones of Jimmerson Hansen in place and stead of Joseph W. Houston as counsel for appellant. 00-15252
09/08/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jennifer Elliott-Tavano.
09/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 16, 2000. 00-16620
10/19/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-18586
10/31/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-19153
10/31/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.