judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FREDERICK CHARLES WILKENING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-55)
Case Number:06-55Case Docketed On:03/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:FREDERICK CHARLES WILKENING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FREDERICK CHARLES WILKENING, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFredrick Charles Wilkening Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/15/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/22/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other. Received copy of order appointing public defender to represent appellant.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
03/27/2006Service - Mail returned. Received original docketing letter to appellant, returned to sender. Copy of docketing letter had been sent to Donna D. Domonkos, Appellate Counsel as a courtesy. No action necessary.ServiceMail returnedFinal
03/28/2006Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
04/13/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal