judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE LEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0948
Short Caption:TYRONE LEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Lead:10-CF-0948Consolidated: 10-CF-0976
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-22678-08Filed Date:07/28/2010

Opening Event Date:07/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/07/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/20/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/16/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ephraim Wernick YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/24/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-948 and 10-CF-976 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-948. F/O that Donna Biderman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appelalnt in appeal no. 10-CF-976. F/O that counsel for both appellants shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court records and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeals. (JAC)
09/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (LEE) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED (PII)
10/04/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 24, 2010, directing counsel for appellant Michael A. Hunter to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant Michael A. Hunter shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
10/25/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo) (Hunter)
10/25/2010RECEIVED - statement regarding transcript (Hunter)
10/29/2010 On consideration of appellant Michael A. Hunter's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant Michael A. Hunter's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript of Michael A. Hunter is filed. (JAC)
10/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (Michael A. Hunter) (RT ordered/needed)
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/17/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (128 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 5/17/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (146 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/18/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (74 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 5/19/10 proc. a.m.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (9 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/19/10 proc. p.m.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (63 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 5/20/10 proc. a.m.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (164 pgs/Hunt) 5/20/10 proc. p.m.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (14 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/21/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (126 pgs/Armstrong) 5/24/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (75 pgs/Van Bremen) 5/25/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (29 pgs/Coney) 5/26/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (33 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (14 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/cd
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/07/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CF-976)
01/07/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-976)
01/07/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CF-948)
01/07/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-948)
01/10/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (SEALED pleadings in 10-CF-948)
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (SEALED pleadings in 10-CF-976)
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Lee) no oppo
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 30, 2011 (Hunter)
03/02/2011 On consideration of appellant Tyrone Lee's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, and the motion of appellant Michael A. Hunter for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Lee is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Hunter is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 30, 2011. (Castillo)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Lee) no oppo
05/25/2011 On consideration of appellant Tyrone Lee's motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant Lee's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to Aug. 31. 2011 (HUNTER)
07/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Hunter's motion for extention of time to 8/31/11.
08/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 90 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (LEE)
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Tyrone Lee's motion for extension of time to 11/14/11.
08/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until December 5, 2011 (HUNTER) (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant Michael A. Hunter's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix.
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Lee) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Tyrone Lee's motion to the extent that brief and limited appendix due 2/6/12.
12/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until December 12, 2011 (Appellant) (Hunter)Granted
12/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Michael A. Hunter's motion for an extension of time and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief & limited appendix of Hunter.
12/22/2011FiledBrief (Hunter) (Appellant)
12/22/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
02/06/2012FiledBrief (Lee) (Appellant)
02/06/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/07/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/07/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/20/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Oberly, Newman
07/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Glickman, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge)
08/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing /rehearing en banc (Appellant - Lee)Granted
08/16/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc to 9/10/12. (TYRONE LEE)
08/22/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/16/2012FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
10/16/2012FiledMandate
01/16/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)