Case: 01-86-00340-CR
01-86-00340-CR
05/01/1986
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Gonzales, Russell Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/26/1988 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
01/26/1988 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
12/16/1987 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
11/18/1987 | Writ disposed | Refused | |
07/15/1987 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
07/13/1987 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
07/01/1987 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
06/04/1987 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/04/1987 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/21/1987 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
05/20/1987 | Submitted | | |
05/20/1987 | Submission | | |
05/20/1987 | Submitted | | |
05/04/1987 | Submission | | |
04/30/1987 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
04/15/1987 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/12/1987 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | |
02/05/1987 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | |
01/15/1987 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
01/15/1987 | Brief filed | | |
01/15/1987 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/12/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/30/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/22/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/13/1986 | Record filed | | |
09/25/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/15/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/01/1986 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
05/01/1986 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/26/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Kathy Giannaula |
State | Criminal - Appellant | James M. Leitner |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
434,364
50 yrs TDC