judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. ANZALONE

Case Information: 38125
Short Caption:STATE VS. ANZALONECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38185
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A384649Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Venue
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker.
07/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11356
07/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 01-11456
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 6, 2001. 01-11538
07/17/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
07/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12410
07/24/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
02/06/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: Continued pending determination of pending Writ of Mandamus in case no. 38185 filed by Appellants on 7/17/01. 02-02425
03/22/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. This case has been decided by Writ in No. 38185. Accordingly, this appeal is moot. 02-05162
04/12/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Christopher G. Gellner. He is removed as counsel and is substituted by Kevin J. Mirch. 02-06608
05/16/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-08632
05/16/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-08690
05/17/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-08765
05/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On May 16, 2002, the parties filed a joint motion to dismiss this appeal and for issuance of the remittitur to coincide with issuance of the notice in lieu of remittitur "in the companion Nevada Supreme Court Case No. 38185." On May 17, 2002, appellants filed a separate motion to dismiss appeal. Cause appearing, appellants' May 17, 2002, motion is granted, and ' . . . this appeal is dismissed.' The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). The clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur in this appeal on May 23, 2002, the same date that the notice in lieu of remittitur will issue in Docket No. 38185. The parties' joint motion to dismiss filed on May 16, 2002, is denied as moot. 02-08945
05/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09053
05/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/17/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 28, 2002. 02-09053