judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM L. HARGRAVES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0911
Short Caption:WILLIAM L. HARGRAVES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD5866-10Filed Date:07/21/2010

Opening Event Date:07/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/03/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam L. Hargraves Y
Edward E. SchwabYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ed Schwab, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ed Schwab, Esquire
09/20/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 3, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (84pgs/Tape) 6/30/10 proc.
09/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (44pgs/Tape) 7/1/10 proc. w/CD included
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/24/2010RECORD INDEX
09/24/2010RECORD COPIES
09/28/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/12/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
10/12/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding
10/22/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
10/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 28, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
12/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
12/22/2010RECEIVED- aplt's brief and appendix
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/04/2011APPENDIX
02/03/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/03/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of May 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by MAR. 25, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
03/23/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/02/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
06/13/2011LETTER from counsel for Appellant for failure to appear at Oral Argument
06/13/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to Reschedule Oral Argument (no oppo).
06/15/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/2011On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion to re-schedule oral argument, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied and this matter is hereby submitted for decision without argument by either party. (RZ,FI,B-R)
06/15/2011SUBMITTED (RZ,FI,B-R)
07/11/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Ruiz, Fisher, and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges.)
08/03/2011FiledMandate