judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL DAVID KELLY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-37)
Case Number:06-37Case Docketed On:02/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL DAVID KELLY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL DAVID KELLY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael David KellyKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 45
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/03/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/17/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/16/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
09/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/16/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record; and received copy of brief on disk.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/08/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/08/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, confidential file; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/15/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Mandate. Copy sent to Warden and DOC attorney.Notice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/02/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Clerk of District Court for record and Warden for mandate.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal