judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

AIRLINE MOTOR COACHES, INC. v. MRS. ELVA BENNETT, ET AL., ESTATE OF MRS. ELVA BENNETT, DECEASED, ET AL.

Case: A-423
A-423
12/27/1944
Application for Writ of Error
AIRLINE MOTOR COACHES, INC.
MRS. ELVA BENNETT, ET AL., ESTATE OF MRS. ELVA BENNETT, DECEASED, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/29/1945Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/06/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/07/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/31/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/01/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
12/27/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/1945Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
10/29/1945Reply to Response
10/26/1945Response to Motion filed
10/15/1945Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
10/02/1945Suggestion of Death
06/06/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/07/1945Supplemental Brief filed
02/26/1945Letter Filed
02/14/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/14/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/14/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/14/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/01/1945Response to Petition
01/01/1945Additional Copies receivedFiling granted
12/27/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/27/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Airline Motor Coaches, Inc.Petitioner
Mrs. Elva Bennett, et al.Respondent
Estate of Mrs. Elva Bennett, deceased, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information