Case: 11-16-00108-CV
11-16-00108-CV
04/19/2016
Contract
Bitter Creek Water Supply Corporation
Wesley Sims
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/01/2016 | Case stored | | |||||||
09/01/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
06/23/2016 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
06/23/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
06/23/2016 | Case reinstated | | |||||||
06/20/2016 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
04/29/2016 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||||
04/29/2016 | Motion to abate appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/26/2016 | Motion to abate appeal filed |
| |||||||
04/26/2016 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||||
04/26/2016 | Fee paid | | |||||||
04/20/2016 | Response filed |
| |||||||
04/19/2016 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
04/19/2016 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
04/15/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court |
| |||||||
03/17/2016 | Judgment signed by trial court judge |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/01/2016 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/01/2022 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bitter Creek Water Supply Corporation | Appellant | Wayne C. Watson Jessica L. Haile |
Sims, Wesley | Appellee | Lance Hall |
Trial Court Information
32nd District Court
Nolan
Honorable Glen Harrison, Judge
19,506
Mary Margaret Sparks Cox, Court Reporter