Case: 14-86-00454-CV
14-86-00454-CV
06/16/1986
Contract
Straite, Eveline
Krisman, Leonard M., et ux
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
05/05/1988 | Case stored | | |
10/08/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/08/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/28/1987 | No description available. | | |
08/13/1987 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
08/13/1987 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
04/29/1987 | Submitted | | |
04/29/1987 | Submission | | |
04/29/1987 | Submitted | | |
03/16/1987 | Submission | | |
12/08/1986 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
12/08/1986 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/08/1986 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/14/1986 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
10/30/1986 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/14/1986 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/25/1986 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/15/1986 | No description available. | | |
09/11/1986 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/14/1986 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
07/03/1986 | No description available. | GRANTED | |
06/17/1986 | No description available. | | |
06/16/1986 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
06/16/1986 | Transcript FILED | | |
06/16/1986 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/07/1986 | No description available. | | |
03/07/1986 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/05/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Joe R. Blackburn |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | John A. Davis, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Joseph W. Ryan |
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
80-22758