judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONTAY WELLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0951
Short Caption:DONTAY WELLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-1118-10Filed Date:07/29/2010

Opening Event Date:07/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/28/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDontay Wells YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Montrell Scaife, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Montrell Scaife, Esquire
09/17/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed)
09/17/2010RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript
09/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
09/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
10/28/2010RECORD INDEX
10/28/2010RECORD COPIES
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (81 pgs/Maddox) 4/14/10 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (9 pgs/White) 4/20/10 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (145 pgs/White) 4/21/10 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (140 pgs/White) 4/22/10 proc.
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (162 pgs/Allison) 4/26/10 proc.
10/28/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (57 pgs/Allison) 4/27/10 proc. (Excerpt)(Corrected pages 24, 25, 26, 27 inserted from CCRD on 11/8/11) TJL
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (14 pgs/tape) 6/30/10 proc. w/cd
10/28/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/13/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/13/2010APPENDIX
01/04/2011APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEFby January 25, 2011 (unopposed)
01/07/2011ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's amended brief shall be filed on or before January 24, 2011, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (JAC)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
02/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to March 29, 2011 (no oppo).
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 29, 2011. (JAC)
03/29/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/29/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
04/20/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/01/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
09/01/2011WithdrawnACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/03/2011FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant Wells, Appellee United States)
10/05/2011FiledOrder Granting joint motion to reschedule oral argument.
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/02/2011FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Oberly, Steadman Montrell L. Scaife, Esq. for appellant L. Jackson Thomas II, Esq. for appellee
12/08/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge)
12/30/2011FiledMandate
01/17/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
09/11/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/22/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)