judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32010
Short Caption:LEWIS (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140456Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09827
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31623, 31986, 32009, 32010, 32049, 32057, 32060, 32080.
09/10/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
09/10/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed."NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12068
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13762
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13762