judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSLIN VS. JOSLIN

Case Information: 38121
Short Caption:JOSLIN VS. JOSLINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9902261Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Thomas C. Bradley, Esq.--check no. 4527.
07/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11287
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12322
07/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Casey Campbell withdraws as counsel for respondent. J. Douglas Clark remains as counsel of record. 01-12365
07/23/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
08/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Gloria M. Petroni as co-counsel. 01-13989
08/20/2001Other Other. Mailed additional document (Notice of Association of Counsel) to Settlement Judge Lester H. Berkson.
09/11/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-15304
09/24/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-16050
10/08/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-16849
01/10/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/09/02. 02-00713
01/10/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-00714
02/07/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 11, 2002. 02-02473
03/08/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/08/02 (Reno/Carson). Signed by: Gloria M. Petroni. 02-04259
04/09/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 04/08/02. Signed by: Thomas C. Bradley. 02-06277
07/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-11553
07/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15645
10/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15823
10/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2002. 02-15823