judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY DWAYNE MONROE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0907
Short Caption:ANTHONY DWAYNE MONROE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-40-10Filed Date:07/20/2010

Opening Event Date:07/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony D. Monroe Y
Charles R. Allen YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/05/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Charles R. Allen, Esquire, is hereby assigned as the pro bono counsel representing appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/05/2010ASSIGNING COUNSEL PRO BONO Charles R. Allen, Esquire
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (84 pgs/Johnson) 4/23/10 proc.
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (32 pgs/Ott) 4/26/10 proc. CD attached
08/31/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/16/2010RECORD COPIES
09/16/2010RECORD INDEX
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/2/10
11/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 2, 2010. (Csstillo)
12/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days after receipt of transcript.
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/10/2011APPENDIX
02/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/08/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appendix
04/13/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...The trial court did not err in finding that the police officer's momentary or fleeting use of a flashlight to look into appellant's car did not violate the Fourth Amendment...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
04/13/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and IS AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE)
05/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED