Case: 08-11-00367-CV
08-11-00367-CV
12/01/2011
Injunction
John F. Cook
Tom Brown Ministries, Word of Life Church of El Paso, Tom Brown, El Pasoans for Traditional Family Values, Salvador Gomez, Ben Mendoza, Elizabeth Branham and Richarda Momsen, solely in her official capacity as El Paso City Clerk
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/24/2012 | Additional authorities filed | Appellee | |
01/23/2012 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
01/17/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
01/11/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
12/27/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/20/2019 | Fee paid |
| |||||
01/03/2014 | Fee paid |
| |||||
02/13/2013 | Mandate issued | | |||||
02/08/2013 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
12/14/2012 | Petition for review disposed by Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
08/27/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/23/2012 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
03/19/2012 | Petition for writ of mandamus received | | |||||
03/07/2012 | Petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
03/07/2012 | Petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
02/17/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/17/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/17/2012 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
02/17/2012 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Rendered |
| ||||
02/17/2012 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
02/16/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/13/2012 | Response filed | | |||||
02/07/2012 | Fee requested | | |||||
02/07/2012 | Response requested by the court | | |||||
02/07/2012 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||
01/24/2012 | Additional authorities filed | | |||||
01/24/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
01/23/2012 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
01/20/2012 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/20/2012 | Motion to appear pro hac vice disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/20/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/20/2012 | Document filed | | |||||
01/20/2012 | Motion filed | | |||||
01/20/2012 | Motion to appear pro hac vice filed | | |||||
01/18/2012 | Order entered | | |||||
01/17/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/17/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
01/11/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
01/10/2012 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
01/10/2012 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |||||
01/10/2012 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
01/09/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/09/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
01/09/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/27/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
12/20/2011 | Order entered | | |||||
12/19/2011 | Letter filed | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
12/12/2011 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||
12/08/2011 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
12/07/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
12/05/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
12/01/2011 | Court fee due | | |||||
12/01/2011 | Order entered | | |||||
12/01/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/13/2013 | Retention | Civil case to be retained permanently (archived) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Richarda Momsen, solely in her official capacity as El Paso City Clerk | Appellee | Hon. Charlie F. McNabb |
Cook, John F. | Appellant | Hon. Mark C. Walker |
Tom Brown Ministries, Word of Life Church of El Paso, Tom Brown, El Pasoans for Traditional Family Values, Salvador Gomez, Ben Mendoza and Elizabeth Branham | Appellee | Hon. Theresa Caballero Hon. Joel Oster Hon. Stuart L. Leeds Hon. Kevin Hayden Theriot |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
El Paso
Honorable The Honorable Javier Alvarez
2011-DCV-02792