Case: 09-0555
09-0555
07/10/2009
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
CYTRINA DIANE BOWEN AND LOU BOWEN
SABRE REALTY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/2009 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to PFR. | |
07/10/2009 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Cytrina Diane Bowen, et al. (12) | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/23/2009 | Case Stored | G02 Row 15 G-5 | | |
10/02/2009 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
08/21/2009 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
07/21/2009 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/16/2009 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver filed on behalf of Sabre Realty Management, Inc. (3) | | |
07/10/2009 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to PFR. | | |
07/10/2009 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Cytrina Diane Bowen, et al. (12) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/23/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 15 G-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sabre Realty Management, Inc. | Respondent | Ms. Amy Reilly Sallusti |
Bowen, Cytrina Diane | Petitioner | Mr. Charles W. McGarry |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-08-00499-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
___ SW3d ___, 04-21-09
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Michael J. O'Neill
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
Dallas
Honorable Mark B. Greenberg
CC-06-18403-E