Case: D-1985
D-1985
01/16/1992
Second App Writ Error
OSCAR PINA
CHEMICAL EXPRESS CARRIERS INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/03/1992 | Reply to Response | Respondent | of Chemical Express Carriers, Inc. | |
01/16/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | On behalf of Oscar Pina | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/08/1992 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No rehearing filed | | |
05/22/1992 | Notice requesting filing fee | mo/re of cond app - $10.00 | | |
05/06/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/06/1992 | Conditional app writ err disposed | Dismissed | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/06/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Application denied. Conditional app. dismissed. | | |
05/06/1992 | Conditional app writ err disposed | Dismissed | | |
02/06/1992 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
02/03/1992 | Reply to Response | of Chemical Express Carriers, Inc. | | |
01/16/1992 | Conditional application for writ of error filed | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
01/16/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | On behalf of Oscar Pina | | |
01/16/1992 | Conditional application for writ of error filed | On behalf of Chemical Express Carriers, Inc. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/08/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CHEMICAL EXPRESS CARRIERS, INC | Respondent | Mr. David T. Moran Mr. Jack Pew Jr. Mr. David L. Curl |
PINA, OSCAR | Petitioner | Mr. Charles Louis Roberts Mr. James F. Scherr |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-91-00037-CV
Rev/Ren/Rem/Aff
819 SW2d 585, 10-16-91
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable LARRY FULLER
Trial Court Information
171st District Court
El Paso
Honorable Peter S. Peca
88-10560