judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES VS. GADSBY

Case Information: 38136
Short Caption:JONES VS. GADSBYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0002520Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/06/2001 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Del Hardy Esq.--check no. 3221.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11384
07/19/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12320
08/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-18161
11/16/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-19267
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-19405
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
11/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 5, 2001. (no action required-dismissed 11/20/01) 01-19884