Case: 96-0756
96-0756
08/14/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
KACTUS KORRAL INC. KORRAL TRUCKING INC.
THE THIRTEENTH COURT OF APPEALS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
08/30/1996 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Respondent | on behalf of John & Jewel Flores Backdated accordingly | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/22/1996 | Case Stored | | | |
09/12/1996 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | W/Agreed motion to consolidate dismissed as moot. | |
08/30/1996 | Notice requesting filing fee | To Mr. James L. Post for $5 for reply to petition for writ of mandamus | | |
08/30/1996 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | on behalf of John & Jewel Flores Backdated accordingly | | |
08/26/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion | Agreed motion to consolidate 96-0756 & 96-0740 | | |
08/26/1996 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10 Fee for Motion to Consolidate from Atty. John Curney, Jr. | | |
08/14/1996 | Exhibits received | attached to Petition | | |
08/14/1996 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | | | |
08/14/1996 | Petition for writ received | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/22/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 1C1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FLORES, JEWEL | Respondent | Mr. James L. Post |
GONZALEZ EMPLOYEE LEASING, INC | Other interested party | Mr. John M. Curney Jr. |
KACTUS KORRAL | Relator | Mr. John M. Curney Jr. |
FLORES, JOHN | Respondent | Mr. James L. Post |
ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA | Other interested party | Mr. Robert B. Summers |
KORRAL TRUCKING, INC. | Relator | Mr. John M. Curney Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-96-00205-CV
Conditionally Granted
___ SW2d ___, 11-07-96
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable MELCHOR CHAVEZ
Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Gonzales
Honorable Dwight E. Peschel
18,457