Case: 06-92-00052-CV
06-92-00052-CV
05/29/1992
Divorce
Williams, Damon Dwayne
Williams, Jeannette Lee
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/28/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
10/09/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/25/1992 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
07/28/1992 | Submitted | | |
07/28/1992 | Submission | | |
07/17/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
07/17/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/26/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
05/29/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/29/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/09/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Williams, Damon Dwayne | Appellant | Hon. Richard D. Williams |
Williams, Jeannette Lee | Appellee | Hon. Sharon E. Reynerson |
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Fannin
Honorable Henry G Braswell
30074