judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELAFUENTES VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38135
Short Caption:DELAFUENTES VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A359379Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Fitzgibbons & Anderson--check no. 49808.
07/06/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-11383
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Retention of Counsel and Answer. The real parties in interest shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain counsel and have counsel file a notice of appearance with this court. Counsel shall have 30 days from the date of appearance within which to file, on behalf of respondents, and answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-14296
09/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondents: P. Sterling Kerr. 01-16134
10/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Real Parties in Interest and Respondents' Request for Enlargement of Time. 01-17882
10/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Motion for Extension of Time). 01-17958
10/30/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 24, 2001. The real parties in interest shall have until November 26, 2001, to file and serve their answer. 01-18163
11/21/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties' in Interest and Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition. 01-19580
12/10/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Response to Real Parties in Interest Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition. 01-20748
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. fn1[Because may 13, 2001, fell on a Sunday, the five-year period expired on may 14, 2001.] "We grant this petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus." fn10[We deny as moot DeLafuentes' motion for leave to file a reply to the Kattans' answer.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20935
12/13/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Mark R. Anderson for service upon Judge Michael A. Cherry. 01-20952
12/27/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Michael Cherry on December 20, 2001. 01-20952
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-00215
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.