judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZINA JASPER v. BURTON FIELD BRINCKERHOFF

Case Heading (S-07-0124)
Case Number:S-07-0124Case Docketed On:06/11/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ZINA JASPER v. BURTON FIELD BRINCKERHOFF
Full Title:ZINA JASPER, f/k/a ZINA BRINCKERHOFF, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BURTON FIELD BRINCKERHOFF, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantZina JasperKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeBurton Field BrinckerhoffDouglas James Mason

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Fraud, Marriage and Divorce - Alimony, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 32
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/11/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/11/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/30/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/07/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/24/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/24/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/10/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/10/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/17/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/14/08 by Obrecht.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal