judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEYES VS. CLARK COUNTY

Case Information: 38134
Short Caption:KEYES VS. CLARK COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411678Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/19/2001 / Richitt, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11380
07/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/13/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hardy & Hardy--check no. 8789.
07/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12119
07/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Paul Richitt, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/22/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 16, 2002. 01-17738
06/10/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 9, 2002. 02-10071
09/10/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 23, 2002. 02-15676
09/30/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-16893
10/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-17517
10/28/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-18504
11/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-19025
11/05/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.