judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CORAY MILNES, Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley M. Milnes, Probate No. 2005-22, Eighth Judicial District, Platte County, Wyoming and CORAY MILNES, personally v. JESSE J. MILNES

Case Heading (S-07-0123)
Case Number:S-07-0123Case Docketed On:06/08/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:CORAY MILNES, Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley M. Milnes, Probate No. 2005-22, Eighth Judicial District, Platte County, Wyoming and CORAY MILNES, personally v. JESSE J. MILNES
Full Title:CORAY MILNES, Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley M. Milnes, Probate No. 2005-22, Eighth Judicial District, Platte County, Wyoming and CORAY MILNES, personally, Appellants (Defendants), v. JESSE J. MILNES, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCoray MilnesDouglas Fowler
AppelleeJesse J. MilnesDon W. Riske
Sean Charles Chambers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Probate
Opinion Number:2008 WY 11
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/08/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (received on 06/07/07; had to request order and findings of fact from District Court Clerk)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/08/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/03/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
07/26/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/04/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Sean Charles Chambers for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Douglas FowlerNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Douglas Fowler for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2007Correspondence - Incoming from District Court Clerk, appellant failed to file a designation of record on appealCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/27/2007Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
10/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/04/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
10/18/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court at the University of Wyoming College of Law (Douglas Fowler for appellants; Don W. Riske and Sean C. Chambers, argument by Mr. Chambers for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/01/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/20/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by Mona McAuley.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal