judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENNIS D. OUTLAW V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0925
Short Caption:DENNIS D. OUTLAW V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-21281-09Filed Date:07/23/2010

Opening Event Date:07/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/22/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDennis D. Outlaw Y
Marc L. ResnickYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sarah T. ChassonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Marc Resnick, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Marc Resnick, Esquire
09/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
11/24/2010RECORD INDEX
11/24/2010RECORD COPIES
11/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (228-ps/tjanifer 4/27-29/10 proc.)
11/24/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (353-pgs/richer 4/30 thru 5/4/10 proc.)w/cd
11/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/20/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 1, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
02/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
02/09/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
02/09/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
02/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (Castillo)
02/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/attached appendix
03/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/18/11 (unopposed)
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/06/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
09/28/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/18/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
11/22/2011FiledArgued Before Washington,Thompson,Reid. Marc L.Resnick Esq.,for appellant Sarah T.Chasson Esq.,for appellee
01/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Reid*, Senior Judge.)
02/14/2012FiledMandate