judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAMSEY ELLIOTT BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0912
Short Caption:RAMSEY ELLIOTT BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-2707-06Filed Date:07/21/2010

Opening Event Date:07/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/07/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRamsey E. Brown YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Vivien Cockburn YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/05/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 21, 2010, and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Christine Pembroke, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/05/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christine Pembroke, Esquire
11/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010RECORD COPIES
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/23/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for a briefing order
12/01/2010ORDERED: That the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/10/2011APPENDIX
02/11/2011RECEIVED - ltr w/o attachments re redacted medical records (exhibit 15)
02/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/14/11. no oppo
02/22/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 14, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 3/21/11
03/17/2011RECEIVED- aple's brief
03/23/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (By: JAC)
03/23/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/23/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
04/05/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/27/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/20/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/07/2011FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to submit.
12/07/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Reid
12/22/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.*)
12/29/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for reh/reh en banc
03/02/2012FiledMandate