Case: 01-10-00991-CR
01-10-00991-CR
11/12/2010
DWI
Timothy Baldassari
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/05/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
07/18/2011 | Letter received | | |||||
06/21/2011 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||
06/17/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/15/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
03/31/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
03/31/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
03/30/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
01/19/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
01/19/2011 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
12/27/2010 | Record due | | |||||
12/22/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
12/22/2010 | Letter filed | | |||||
12/20/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
11/22/2010 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||
11/12/2010 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
11/12/2010 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
11/03/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/28/2010 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/17/2036 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
06/28/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Baldassari, Timothy | Criminal - Appellant | Timothy Baldassari |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Patricia Rae R. Lykos Alan Keith Curry |
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable Susan Brown
1231773
2 Yrs TDCJ