judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSS VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38118
Short Caption:ROSS VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A430280Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
07/05/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kummer Kaempfer Bonner & Renshaw--check no. 34825.
07/05/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-11264
07/05/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. 01-11266
07/05/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Petitioners' Application for a Stay pending Supreme Court Proceedings. 01-11267
07/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
07/10/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitioner's Application for a Stay. 01-11584
07/17/2001Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Verification of L. Joe Coppedge in Support of Petitioners Daniel C. Ross and C. David Burgin's Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition. 01-12113
08/31/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Appearance/Change of Address. The law firm of Lewis and Roca is additional counsel of record with Kummer, Kaempfer, Bonner & Renshaw. 01-14812
09/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn2[In light of this order, we deny petitioners' motion for a stay as moot.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15335
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-15603
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.