judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT RIKARD V. LONG FENCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-0916
Short Caption:ROBERT RIKARD V. LONG FENCE COMPANY, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAC4984-09Filed Date:07/17/2010

Opening Event Date:07/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Rikard NPro SeN
AppelleeLong Fence Company Inc.N
Miltiadis N. TheologouNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 17, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 9/11/09, 12/15/09, 3/4/10, 4/22/10, 5/10/10 & 7/8/10) (elp)
08/19/2010STATEMENT-of aplt of issues (*to appeal decision of trial court Judge Joseph E. Beshouri) (elp)
10/28/2010 On consideration of the Statement Regarding Transcript filed with this court on August 19, 2010, and it appearing that there is no order for transcripts pending with the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, advise this court as to the status of the transcripts. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (JAC) elp
11/10/2010RECEIVED COPY OF APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT. (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 7/8/10) (elp)
11/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY-of the judgement
11/18/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from an ORDER OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE W/O first having sought review by a Superior Court Judge. See DC Code 11-1732(k)(2001). It is ****MORE*****
11/18/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW)
11/18/2010TMC - OTSC - appellant's motion to stay - ROTSC
11/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (29-pgs/tape 7/8/10 proc.) w/cd
12/03/2010RECORD INDEX
12/09/2010RECEIVED - aplt's response to order to show cause dated 11/18/10
12/17/2010 ORDERED that this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction... It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for stay is denied as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall transmita copy of the 7/17/10 NOA to the Clerk, Superior Court to be filed, NPT to 7/17/10... (RZNBTE)
12/17/2010DISMISSED
01/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED