Case: PD-1766-04
PD-1766-04
02/08/2005
PDR Case Type
CRUM, TERRY MICHAEL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/26/2005 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
04/27/2005 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/18/2005 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
02/08/2005 | PDR FILED | | |
11/10/2004 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted | |
11/10/2004 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/26/2005 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CRUM, TERRY MICHAEL | Appellant | TERRY MICHAEL CRUM |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-02-00371-CR
Affirmed
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable FRED A. MOORE
005450