judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALM MEDIA PROPERTIES, LLC V. POM WONDERFUL, LLC

Case Information: 10-CV-0904
Short Caption:ALM MEDIA PROPERTIES, LLC V. POM WONDERFUL, LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5533-10Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/08/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlm Media Properties LLCN
Bruce D. BrownNY
Laurie A. Babinski NN
AppelleePom Wonderful LLCN
AppelleePom Wonderful LLCN
Barry CoburnNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY-of temporay restraining order or,in the alternaive motion to stay emergency
07/30/2010AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
07/30/2010RECEIVED - Amici Curiae brief (Wash Post, Amer Soc of News Editors, Assc Press, Dow Jones & Co., Gannett Co., N.Y. Times, NPR, Reporters Committee, Freedom of Press & Soc of Professional Jounalists.)
08/05/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL emergency
08/17/2010 ORDERED taht APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IS GRANTED and this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13(a). It is *****MORE*****
08/17/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is ****MORE*****
08/17/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE the lodged AMICI CURIAE BRIEF IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BY: ETW) lw
08/17/2010DISMISSED
09/08/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived