judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHIELDS VS. SOUTHWEST MEDICAL

Case Information: 38117
Short Caption:SHIELDS VS. SOUTHWEST MEDICALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A361106Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/02/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 23508.
07/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11170
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/18/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12192
07/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
07/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Law firm of Jimmerson Hansen associates as co-counsel for respondent. 01-12650
07/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson.
10/09/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-16963
10/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-17647
11/13/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. . 01-18870
11/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK 01-19556
11/21/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.