judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDDIE ANGELO FERNANDEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0120)
Case Number:S-07-0120Case Docketed On:06/04/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:EDDIE ANGELO FERNANDEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:EDDIE ANGELO FERNANDEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEddie Angelo FernandezDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 198
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/04/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/23/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
09/06/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cathleen Parker for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/18/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court at the University of Wyoming College of Law (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/31/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/31/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/3/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal