Case: 09-11-00007-CR
09-11-00007-CR
01/06/2011
Poss of Marihuana
Mark Ezekiel Cane
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/19/2011 | Case stored | | |||
04/19/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||
02/23/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
02/11/2011 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||
01/28/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||
01/12/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||
01/06/2011 | Trial court certification filed | | |||
01/06/2011 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/19/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Rodney D. Conerly |
Cane, Mark Ezekiel | Criminal - Appellant | Douglas M. Barlow |
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Layne Walker
08-04076
18 months state jail