judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE FARM VS. ABELLANA

Case Information: 38138
Short Caption:STATE FARM VS. ABELLANACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36677 , 39338
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9807605Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/20/2001 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Burton Bartlett & Glogovac--check no. 9458.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11398
07/16/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District court docket entries. Due Date: 10 days
07/20/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12498
07/25/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell.
09/06/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell.
12/14/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Counsel request that the case remain in the settlement process. Both are waiting for decisions on post trial motions from the district court. These decisions will impact potential settlement options. 01-21123
05/22/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: no date given. 02-08974
05/29/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-09403
08/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a motion for remand, along with a copy of an order of the district court certifying that upon remand, it is inclined to grant the parties' requested relief. If the parties are unable to obtain Huneycutt certification, they shall so inform this court in writing within the same time period. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of these appeals and cross-appeals and cross-appeal as abandoned. Nos. 38138/39338-cases are not consolidated. 02-13997
10/16/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (with prejudice). 02-18016
11/04/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . the appeal in Docket No. 38138 and the appeal and cross-appeal in Docket No. 39338 are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK. Nos. 38138/39338-cases are not consolidated. 02-18890
11/04/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.